FL H0889 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals Center for Health Technologies, FL Biomedical & Social Research Act, Cervical Cancer Elimination Task Force, & FL Cancer Council; revises provisions relating to FL Center for Universal Research to Eradicate Disease; revises advisory council membership; transfers & revises provisions relating to FL Cancer Council mission & duties to include them within William G. "Bill" Bankhead, Jr., & David Coley Cancer Research Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biomedical Research [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0013 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0538 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-34
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00889; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00889
2010-04-26 Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Higher Education; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00857; Substituted for CS/SB 2100 -SJ 00857; Read 2nd time -SJ 00857
2010-04-22 Received -SJ 00754; Referred to Health Regulation; Higher Education; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00754
2010-03-16 In Messages
2010-03-10 Read 3rd time -HJ 00240; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00240
2010-03-09 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229
2010-03-03 CS read 1st time on 03/03/10 -HJ 00204; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00204
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00080; On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall; CS by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00208
2010-03-01 CS by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-02-22 On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall
2010-02-18 Referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council
2010-02-02 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0593 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
H0861 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
H0947 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Health & Family Services Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34)
S0620 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S1954 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S2100 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00857; Substituted CS/HB 889 -SJ 00857; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161) -SJ 00857

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
03810404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
038185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0381855Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0381912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
038192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0381921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0381922Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0889&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb088900.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb088901c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb088902er.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB08890310100538.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB08890427100013.html

Bill Comments

feedback