FL H0837 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises conditional medical release program within DOC; establishes conditional aging inmate release program within DOC.
Title
Inmate Conditional Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-12-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S556 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S574 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1728 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S574 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1728 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/837 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/837/BillText/Filed/PDF |