FL H0799 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of temporary permit to practice as physical therapist or physical therapist assistant; provides requirements for issuing temporary permit; provides for voiding of temporary permit; provides requirements for supervision of temporary permittees; prohibits certain acts concerning temporary permits.
Title
Physical Therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#61 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#124 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1217 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#980 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#124 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1217 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#980 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1714 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1670 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 1643 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1241 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1239 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 820 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 820 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 947 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 946 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 894 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-20 | CS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time -HJ 676 | |
2012-02-20 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-17 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-16 | CS/CS/CS by Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 684 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/16/12, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Education Committee -HJ 451 | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-31 | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 281 | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 260 | |
2012-01-24 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 262 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 78 | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 78 | |
2011-11-29 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
486 | 0715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 1065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |