FL H0771 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to use of office of notary public; authorizes online notarizations & provides requirements & exceptions; provides registration & qualification requirements; authorizes performance of certain notarial acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notaries Public

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-21HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-02-13HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1042 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69528Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7092202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback