FL S1042 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to use of the office of notary public; requiring electronic signatures to include access protection; revising limitations on notary fees to conform to changes made by the act; prescribing online notarization procedures, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notaries Public

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-07HouseIn Messages
2018-03-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 6
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time 849
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (343146) 761
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-20SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-02-20SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-31SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H771 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
117305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69528Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7092202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
732525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/268372/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/436070/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/698574/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/343146/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/586412/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/233988/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Amendment/551806/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1042/Vote/SenateVote_s01042e1018.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback