FL H0753 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Now in Commerce Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises duties of Florida Office of Broadband; establishes Broadband Opportunity Program within DEO; provides requirements for grant awards; authorizes grant applications to be challenged; provides direction for office in prioritizing grant funding; specifies conditions for award of grants; provides for transfer of certain funds from State Transportation Trust Fund to State Economic Enhancement & Economic Development Trust Fund; requires DOT to consult with Florida Office of Broadband to ensure that specified projects are consistent with strategic plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Internet Deployment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-08HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-04HouseCS Filed
2021-03-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-18HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1560 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Now in Appropriations
H1339 (Similar To) 2021-03-05 - Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2889961Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889962Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3640135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback