FL H0751 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exemption from hunter safety course requirements for persons issued a permit, license, or authorization to take game or fur-bearing animals on private land; directs FWCC to adopt rules.
Title
Exemption from Hunter Safety Course Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 64 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 64 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1106 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/751 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0751/BillText/Filed/HTML |