FL H0709 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes in-store servicing of distilled spirits sold by distributor to vendor.
Title
In-store Servicing of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#618 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#618 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Chapter No. 2024-81 | |
2024-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 574 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S574 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 709
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |