FL H0705 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOE to assist DEM in determining strategies regarding evacuation of persons with pets; requires certain counties to designate shelter that can accommodate persons with pets; specifies requirements for such shelters.
Title
Emergency Sheltering of Persons with Pets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#520 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#520 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-132 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 752 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Quality Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Health Quality Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S752 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705