FL S0752 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to assist the Division of Emergency Management in determining strategies regarding the evacuation of persons with pets; requiring counties that maintain designated shelters to designate a shelter that can accommodate persons with pets; specifying requirements for such shelters, etc.
Title
Emergency Sheltering of Persons with Pets
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 705 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 705 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H705 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-132