FL H0675 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership of Board of Pharmacy; establishes Class III institutional pharmacies; provides requirements for such pharmacies; revises notice requirements; authorizes distribution of medicinal drugs & prepackaged drug products without specified permit under certain conditions; removes provision exempting certain drug repackagers from specified permit requirements.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#700 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#700 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-95 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1128 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-21 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-14 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/14/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 675
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |