FL H0667 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2015-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2015-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes criminal witness subpoena commanding witness to appear for deposition to be posted at witness's residence by authorized person if one attempt to serve subpoena has failed.
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2015-59) |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted SB 672 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0672 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-59
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/667 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0667/BillText/Filed/PDF |