FL H0653 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for motion by state attorney to vacate conviction if he or she has evidence that convicted person is innocent or was erroneously convicted; provides procedures; provides for appointment of public defender for an indigent person; provides for appeal of decision.
Title
Vacating Erroneous Convictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1200 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/653 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/653/BillText/Filed/PDF |