FL H0565 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes housing discrimination as cause of action for relief & damages stemming from violations of Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; revises timeframe & conditions under which aggrieved person may commence civil action to enforce specified rights; authorizes, rather than requires, civil action after alleged discriminatory housing practice; authorizes civil action regardless of whether aggrieved person filed complaint with commission; prohibits aggrieved person from filing specified action in certain circumstances; provides exception.
Title
Housing Discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S958 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S1142 (Similar To) 2019-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1142 (Similar To) 2019-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/565 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/565/BillText/Filed/PDF |