FL H0535 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Florida Safe Harbor Act"; provides legislative intent & goals; provides for presumption that placement of child alleged to have been sexually exploited in short-term safe house is necessary; provides requirements for findings in shelter hearing relating to placement of allegedly sexually exploited child in safe house; requires assessment of certain children; provides for use of such assessments, etc.
Title
Sexual Exploitation
Sponsors
Rep. Esteban Bovo [R] | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Sen. Maria Sachs [D] | Rep. John Tobia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-24 | Now in Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00395 | |
2010-03-23 | CS read 1st time on 03/23/10 -HJ 00372; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-22 | CS by Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00380 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), 03/22/10, 3:30 pm, 306-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00050 | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Health & Family Services Policy Council | |
2009-12-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0039 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 524 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 1678 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |