FL S1700 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires delivery of children alleged to be dependant and sexually exploited to short-term safe houses. Requires assessment of certain children for placement in a safe house. Provides requirements for safe houses receiving such children. Provides requirements relating to appropriations for safe houses. Requires districts of the DCFS to address child welfare service needs of sexually exploited children as a component of their master plans, etc.
Title
Sexual Exploitation [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/07/10, 2:30 pm, 401-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00116 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0535 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0039 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 524 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0322 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 1678 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |