FL H0467 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain entities providing services solely to Medicaid recipients under Medicaid contract from being subject to premium tax imposed on premiums, contributions, & assessments received by prepaid limited health service organizations; provides for prospective operation; specifies that act does not provide basis for relief from or assessment of taxes not paid, or for determining any denial of or right to refund of taxes paid, prior to effective date.
Title
Entities Contracting with the Medicaid Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#245 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | In Messages | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time -HJ 710 | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/20/11 | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-07 | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-04-06 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 453 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/05/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 240 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 03/15/11, 9:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 45 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 45 | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0472 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration