FL S0472 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an organization providing services solely to Medicaid recipients under a contract with Medicaid is exempt from paying certain insurance premium taxes. Provides for retroactive operation. Specifies that the act is remedial in nature and not a basis for certain refunds of tax.
Title
Prepaid Limited Health Service Organizations/Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (386990); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 42 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 42 | |
2011-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0467 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/472 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0472/BillText/Filed/HTML |