FL H0425 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Financial Services to provide copies of certain wills and trusts, and any codicils or amendments of such wills and trusts, to certain persons upon request; requiring specified agreements for certain claims; increasing the threshold required to use a different method of identity verification for electronic claims; requiring the department to adopt forms for an Unclaimed Property Recovery Agreement and an Unclaimed Property Purchase Agreement, etc.
Title
Disposition of Unclaimed Property
Sponsors
House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Wyman Duggan [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fetterhoff [R] | Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#121 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#121 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-144 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-21 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1434 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-14 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment 115109 adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment 115109 filed |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | CS Filed |
2021-02-18 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1434 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2021-144)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
717 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 12404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |