FL S1434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2021-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2021-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Financial Services to provide copies of wills and trusts included in safe-deposit box contents under certain circumstances; requiring specified agreements for certain claims; increasing the threshold required to use a different method of identity verification for electronic claims; requiring the department to adopt forms for an Unclaimed Property Recovery Agreement and an Unclaimed Property Purchase Agreement, etc.
Title
Disposition of Unclaimed Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 425 (Ch. 2021-144) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 425 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H425 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-144
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
717 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 12404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |