CA SB1270 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 221, 55433, 55722.5, 55861, 55861.5, 56133, 56382.5, 56571, and 56571.5 of, and to add Chapter 7.2 (commencing with Section 56701) to Division 20 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Department of Food and Agriculture: farm products: licenses and complaints: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent SB1270 Grove (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1270 Grove Senate Third Reading By Alanis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1270 Grove (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1270 Grove Senate Third Reading By Alanis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1270 Grove (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6533.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3919.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3849.) (May 6). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3726.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3629.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI and JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 55433 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 55722.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 55861 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 55861.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 56133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 56382.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 56571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 56571.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 56701 | New Code | See Bill Text |