FL H0407 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that state attorney must either transfer & certify children of certain ages who commit specified crimes for prosecution as adults or provide written reasons; revises circumstances under which state attorney may file information in cases involving children of certain ages who commit certain crimes; provides that children 14 years of age or older, rather than children of any age, who are charged with certain offenses are subject to court jurisdiction until indictment is returned; prohibits transfer of child to adult court for criminal prosecution of indictable offense until child's competency has been restored; authorizes, rather than requires, child who is found to have committed specified crimes to be sentenced according to certain provisions & child to be sentenced as adult if child is found to have committed an offense punishable by death or life imprisonment.
Title
Prosecuting Children As Adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1492 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/407 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/407/BillText/Filed/PDF |