FL H0387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides authorized and prohibited activities related to qualifying improvements to residential properties to be financed by non-ad valorem assessments; requires local government or program administrator to develop written disclosure forms & cancelation forms, & conduct telephone calls to property owner providing specified information; provides criteria that must be met before local government or program administrator may enroll PACE contractors to offer financing for residential properties; specifies types of contracts that are unenforceable; requires local governments that have authorized qualifying improvement programs to post specified information on their websites on annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improvements to Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied on Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-19HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-19HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-19HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-31HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-31HouseReported out of Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-31HouseFavorable by Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-29HouseAdded to Ways & Means Committee agenda
2021-03-23HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-16HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-12House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-12HouseCS Filed
2021-03-12HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-12HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-09HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-08HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1208 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16308Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Amendment/264335/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387a.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387c.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387d.WMC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/387/Analyses/h0387f.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58232&IsPCB=1&BillId=70526
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59083&IsPCB=0&BillId=70526
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59642&IsPCB=0&BillId=70526
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60532&IsPCB=0&BillId=70526

Bill Comments 750

feedback