FL S1208 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that a property owner may apply to a REEF program for certain purposes; providing that costs incurred by the REEF program may be collected as a non-ad valorem assessment; revising the written disclosure statement required to be given by sellers to prospective purchasers when executing a contract for the sale and purchase of certain properties; prohibiting a contractor from engaging in certain practices regarding pricing of qualifying improvements on residential real properties, etc.
Title
Resiliency Energy Environment Florida (REEF) Program
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] | Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] |
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H387 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar