FL H0379 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes veterinarian to report suspected criminal violations relating to dogs or cats to certain officers & agents without notice to or authorization from client.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-03-29HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-29HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2019-03-29HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-28HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S774 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S316 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1236 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S1738 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4742165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
828058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82829Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback