FL H0371 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from surface water management & storage regulations for implementation of certain measures & practices for environmental habitat creation, restoration, & enhancement activities & water quality improvements on specified agricultural lands & government-owned lands; provides condition & requirements for measures & practices; removes requirements for adverse impacts on water resources, certain notification by DEP & water management districts, & commencement of activities.
Title
Management and Storage of Surface Waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S910 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/371 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/371/BillText/Filed/PDF |