FL H0371 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Florida Council on Poverty in DEO; provides membership & organization; requires report to Governor & Legislature; requires abolition of council on specified date.
Title
Florida Council on Poverty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#717 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-02-19 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-16 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/16/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-02-03 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-26 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-10-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0556 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar