FL H0325 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Chapter No. 2010-80; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Preempts to state use of cameras to enforce traffic laws; authorizes counties & municipalities to use traffic infraction detectors under certain circumstances; creates Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program; authorizes DHSMV, county, or municipality to use traffic infraction detector to identify motor vehicle that fails to stop at traffic control signal steady red light, etc. APPROPRIATION: $100,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Traffic Control [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0014 - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0927 - Passage (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Chapter No. 2010-80; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163)
2010-05-13 Approved by Governor
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00889; CS passed; YEAS 30 NAYS 7 -SJ 00889
2010-04-26 Withdrawn from Transportation; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00856; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2166 -SJ 00856; Read 2nd time -SJ 00856
2010-04-23 In Messages; Received -SJ 00800; Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00800
2010-04-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 01026; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01027; CS passed as amended; YEAS 77 NAYS 33 -HJ 01031
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00885; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00885
2010-04-17 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00760
2010-04-16 CS read 1st time on 04/16/10 -HJ 00727; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-14 CS/CS by- Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 00732
2010-04-12 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 04/14/10, 9:15 am, 404-H
2010-03-12 Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00273
2010-03-09 Favorable by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00273
2010-03-05 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/09/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00033; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00166; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00158; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC) -HJ 00163
2010-01-27 Now in Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
2010-01-25 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-13 CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2009-11-20 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Finance & Tax Council
2009-11-06 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0294 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80)
S2166 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Amendment(s) adopted (464122) -SJ 00856; Substituted CS/CS/HB 325 -SJ 00856; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163) -SJ 00856
H5501 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-163; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160076New CodeSee Bill Text
0316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160083New CodeSee Bill Text
03160745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031607456New CodeSee Bill Text
03160776New CodeSee Bill Text
03161967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032150New CodeSee Bill Text
032227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03954036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0325&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb032500.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb032501c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb032502c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb032503e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb032504e2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB03250423100927.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB03250427100014.html

Bill Comments

feedback