FL S0294 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program to be administered by the DOT. Requires a county or municipality to enact an ordinance in order to use a traffic infraction detector to identify a motor vehicle that fails to stop at a traffic control signal steady red light. Provides that the registered owner of the motor vehicle involved in the violation is responsible and liable for payment of the fine assessed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Act [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00029
2009-12-09 Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2009-10-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0325 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Chapter No. 2010-80; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163)
S2166 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Amendment(s) adopted (464122) -SJ 00856; Substituted CS/CS/HB 325 -SJ 00856; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163) -SJ 00856

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160083New CodeSee Bill Text
03160745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031607456New CodeSee Bill Text
03160776New CodeSee Bill Text
03161967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03954036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback