FL S2166 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Amendment(s) adopted (464122) -SJ 00856; Substituted CS/CS/HB 325 -SJ 00856; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163) -SJ 00856
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Preempts to the state the use of cameras to enforce traffic laws. Clarifies the inapplicability of ch. 493, F.S., to laws governing the use of cameras as provided by the act. Authorizes a county or municipality to use traffic infraction detectors. Creates the Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program. Provides for the placement and installation of detectors on certain roads, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Traffic Control [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Amendment(s) adopted (464122) -SJ 00856; Substituted CS/CS/HB 325 -SJ 00856; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163) -SJ 00856
2010-04-22 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703
2010-04-21 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-20 CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 16 NAYS 6 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00709
2010-04-16 Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00600; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/20/10, 2:15 pm, 412-K
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-14 CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00610
2010-04-09 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K
2010-04-08 Withdrawn from Criminal Justice -SJ 00523; Now in Community Affairs
2010-03-22 Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00269
2010-03-18 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2010-03-17 Favorable with 5 amendment(s) by Transportation (436478, 904148, 177538, 957138, 918732); YEAS 8 NAYS 1 -SJ 00269
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00146
2010-03-01 Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0325 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Chapter No. 2010-80; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163)
S0294 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80)
H1235 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
S2712 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H5501 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-163; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 325 (Ch. 2010-80), HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160076New CodeSee Bill Text
0316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160083New CodeSee Bill Text
03160745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031607456New CodeSee Bill Text
03160776New CodeSee Bill Text
0316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032150New CodeSee Bill Text
032227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03954036Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback