FL H0319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook; provides requirements for handbook; provides for distribution of printed copies of the handbook under certain circumstances; requires clerks of court to post electronic copies of handbook on its website & make handbook available to certain applicants; encourages clerks of court to provide list of course providers & websites where certain classes are available; prohibits issuance of marriage license until petitioners verify that both parties have obtained & read Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook or some other presentation of similar information.
Title
Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S682 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 0307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |