FL S0682 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook; providing for distribution of printed copies of the handbook under certain circumstances; requiring clerks of the circuit court to post electronic copies of the handbook on its website and make the handbook available to certain applicants; prohibiting the issuance of a marriage license until petitioners verify that both parties have obtained and read the Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook or some other presentation of similar information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Healthy Marriage Handbook

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-21SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-04SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-31SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2019-10-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H319 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7410307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback