FL H0273 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes policyholder of personal lines insurance to elect delivery of policy documents by electronic means; defines "optional coverage"; revises requirements applicable to insurers when providing notice of change in policy terms for renewal policy to include requirement that notice be an advance notice; authorizes such notice to be sent separately from notice of renewal premium within specified timeframe; requires insurer to provide sample copy of notice of change in policy terms to insurance agent at specified time; prohibits use of such notice to add optional coverage that increases policy's premium unless policyholder approves additional optional coverage.
Title
Insurer Notifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Chapter No. 2015-170 | |
2015-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 202 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Received |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-18 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15 |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-05 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/05/15, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-04 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/15, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0202 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 273 (Ch. 2015-170)
H0165 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-135
S0258 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 165 (Ch. 2015-135), CS/HB 273 (Ch. 2015-170)
H0165 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-135
S0258 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 165 (Ch. 2015-135), CS/HB 273 (Ch. 2015-170)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 43141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |