FL H0231 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes risk protection orders to prevent persons who are at high risk of harming themselves or others from accessing firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Risk Protection Orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S530 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
790401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback