FL H0231 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to schedule for administering comprehensive statewide assessments to provide exception with respect to certain religious holidays.
Title
Statewide Assessments
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Martin Kiar [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Education Policy Council -HJ 00027 | |
2009-11-01 | Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Education Policy Council | |
2009-10-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0224 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12