FL H0219 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Penalizes violations relating to age verification documents of adult theater employees; requires mandatory minimum term of incarceration for solicitation of prostitution, lewdness, or assignation; authorizes educational program to person convicted of such offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of Human Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-04-02HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-28HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S370 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback