FL H0851 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Legal Affairs to establish certain direct-support organization; provides for future review & repeal; provides for instruction on human trafficking; requires specified licensees or certificate holders to post human trafficking public awareness signs in place of work; provides penalties; requires specified continuing education for certain persons; requires Department of Law Enforcement to establish continued employment training component relating to human trafficking; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#387 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#273 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (638435)
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 1
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (589144) 1323
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (638435) 1323
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (589144)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 540
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-30SenateReceived
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-29SenateIn Messages
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26HouseAmendment(s) adopted (875435) 932
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-04-12HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-10HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/09/19, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S540 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 851
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S188 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages
H219 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
450045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78708Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
847001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94317297Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Amendment/323993/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Amendment/875435/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Vote/HouseVote_h00851e1273.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Vote/SenateVote_h00851e1019.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Vote/HouseVote_h00851e1387.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/851/Vote/SenateVote_h00851e1040.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback