FL H0187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises standard by which adults & minors may be considered criminally negligent in storage of firearm; revises exception to prohibition on storing or leaving loaded firearm within reach or easy access of minor who obtains it & commits specified violation; revises requirements for safe storage of loaded firearm; requires seller or transferor of firearm to provide each purchaser or transferee with specified information.
Title
Sale, Transfer, or Storage of Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S208 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1513 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H1513 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/187 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/187/BillText/Filed/PDF |