FL H0173 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for multiagency education plan for students in juvenile justice education programs; revises requirements effective education programs for youth in DJJ programs; revises contract & cooperative agreement requirements for delivery of appropriate education services to youth in DJJ programs; revises requirements for activities to be coordinated by coordinators for juvenile justice education programs; requires that educational program shall be based on each youth's reentry plan & assessed needs; provides requirements for prevention & day-treatment juvenile justice education programs; requires progress monitoring plans for all non-exceptional student students; requires that DOE, in partnership with DJJ, ensure that school districts & juvenile justice education providers develop educational transition plans; requires DOE to establish student performance measures & program performance ratings; requires comprehensive accountability & school improvement process; provides requirements for such process.
Title
Juvenile Justice Education Programs
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Choice and Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#478 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#478 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184) |
2014-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (932990) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 598 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Education; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-03-12 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-06 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-06 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/06/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/19/14, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-01-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-01-09 | House | CS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2013-10-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0598 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
S0850 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-184, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
S0850 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-184, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |