FL H0127 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires governing bodies of counties & municipalities to post their permit & inspection fee schedules & building permit & inspection utilization reports on their websites; requires governing bodies of local governments to create building permit & inspection utilization reports & post reports on their websites by specified date; provides requirements for such governing bodies & reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-20HouseAmendment(s) adopted (308689)
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-07HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-06HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-15HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-14HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-01-23HouseNow in Business and Professions Subcommittee
2019-01-23HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/23/19, 10:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S142 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Placed on 3rd reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55380Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback