FL S0142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 127 (Ch. 2019-121)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 127 (Ch. 2019-121)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the governing bodies of counties and municipalities to post their permit and inspection fee schedules and building permit and inspection utilization reports on their websites; requiring certain governing bodies of local governments to create a building permit and inspection utilization report containing certain information and to post such report on their websites by a specified date, etc.
Title
Permit Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 127 (Ch. 2019-121) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 127 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (255262) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/05/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H127 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-121
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |