FL H0125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00019; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall; Unfavorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 9 -HJ 00207
Pending: House Civil Justice & Courts Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00019; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall; Unfavorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 9 -HJ 00207
Pending: House Civil Justice & Courts Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lenders to notify tenants or lessees of potential foreclosure or short-sale actions against rental property; requires lenders to provide tenants or lessees first right of refusal to purchase property at fair market value; specifies eligibility requirements to exercise such right; requires lenders to use escrow funds for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Rental Property Foreclosure or Short-sale Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00019; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall; Unfavorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 9 -HJ 00207 | |
2010-03-01 | Unfavorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 9 | |
2010-02-22 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall | |
2010-01-05 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2009-10-12 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2009-09-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0854 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary