FL S0854 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lenders to notify tenants or lessees of potential foreclosure or short-sale actions against the rental property. Requires the lenders to provide tenants or lessees a first right of refusal to purchase the property at fair market value. Specifies lender liability for certain costs for failure to comply with certain notice requirements. Specifies time restrictions on tenants or lessees bringing actions for damages, etc.
Title
Rental Property Foreclosure or Short-sale Actions [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance -SJ 00061 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance | |
2009-12-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0125 (Similar To) 2010-03-02 - Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00019; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 01/12/10, 10:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall; Unfavorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), laid on Table; YEAS 2 NAYS 9 -HJ 00207