FL H0119 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 2, Art. I of State Constitution to delete provision authorizing laws that regulate or prohibit ownership, inheritance, disposition, & possession of real property by aliens ineligible for citizenship.
Title
Real Property Rights of Aliens Ineligible for Citizenship
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-10-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1358 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/119 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0119/BillText/Filed/PDF |