FL H0099 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Governor to appoint independent third party to conduct forensic audit of 2020 general election; requires audit of certain precincts; provides dates by which such audit must begin & be completed; provides reporting requirements.
Title
Forensic Audit of the 2020 General Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-22 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-09-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/99 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/99/BillText/Filed/PDF |