FL H0087 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises period of time when conviction, or any other adjudication, for crime may not be grounds for denial of licensure in specified professions; provides exception; removes provision requiring good moral character for licensure in such professions; requires applicable board to approve certain educational program credits offered to inmates in certain institutions or facilities for purposes of satisfying training requirements for licensure in specified professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal History in Professional Licensing Applications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-02HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseFavorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
2021-09-22HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-09-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1118 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
S1548 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules
H1259 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback