FL H1259 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to automatically seal certain criminal history records; specifies effect of automatic sealing.
Title
Automatic Sealing of Criminal History Records
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Spencer Roach [R] | Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Original reference removed: Commerce Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1261 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H87 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S1118 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1548 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H87 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S1118 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1548 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries