FL H0081 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires PSC to approve proposed change in public utility's billing cycle by specified period before its effective date; requires PSC to consider public impact of proposed change; prohibits extension of billing cycle by more than specified period; prohibits utility from charging consumer or user higher rate due to extension; provides exception.
Title
Public Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129) |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0230 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H7109 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
H7109 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/81 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0081/BillText/Filed/PDF |