FL H0073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions stating persons who use or threaten to use force, other than deadly force, do not have duty to retreat before using or threatening to use such force; prohibits use of deadly force by person who knows that he or she can avoid using deadly force with complete safety by retreating; removes provisions stating person using or threatening to use deadly force does not have duty to retreat & has right to stand his or her ground; repeals provisions relating to immunity from criminal prosecution & civil action for justifiable use or threatened use of force.
Title
Use or Threatened Use of Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-17 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-09-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S888 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H6115 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H6115 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/73 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/73/BillText/Filed/PDF |