FL S0888 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Self-Defense Restoration Act"; deleting provisions stating that persons who use or threaten to use force, other than deadly force, do not have a duty to retreat before using or threatening to use such force in defense of persons or property; prohibiting the use of deadly force by a person who knows that he or she can avoid the necessity of using deadly force with complete safety by retreating; repealing a provision relating to immunity from criminal prosecution and civil action for justifiable use or threatened use of force, etc.
Title
Use or Threatened Use of Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H73 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H6115 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H6115 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/888 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/888/BillText/Filed/HTML |